Cooper v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Victor Wayne Cooper
Defendant: State of California, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Jeffrey A. Beard, Tim Perez, F Covey, S Aref, Howard Gains, B LeMasters, R Franco, Fabrica Hadjaj and M. Gill
Case Number: 3:2015cv05800
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER OF REFERRAL; DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 29, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 20, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SCREENING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANANGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 5, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Wayne Cooper
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Represented By: Martine Noel D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Represented By: Martine Noel D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Perez
Represented By: Martine Noel D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Aref
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Gains
Represented By: Martine Noel D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B LeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabrica Hadjaj
Represented By: Martine Noel D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?