Kresich v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: John Kresich
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05801
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 29 Motion for Sanctions. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
November 9, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 25 Stipulation: Jury Selection set for 8/7/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, Sa n Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. JJury Trial set for 8/9/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 8/11/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Designation of Experts due by 12/20/2016. Discovery due by 1/17/2017. Expert Witness List due by 12/20/2016. Dispositive Motion due by 2/16/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
April 4, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/4/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 7, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 13 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kresich v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kresich
Represented By: Eric B Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James Christopher Castle
Represented By: Michael A.S. Newman
Represented By: Royal F. Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?