Seidman v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Victoria Seidman
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05815
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER. The action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
April 25, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/25/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 8, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CMC CONFERENCE FROM MARCH 25, 2016 TO APRIL 22, 2016 OR AS APPROPRIATE; ORDER. The Case Management Conference presently scheduled for March 25, 2016 is continued to April 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seidman v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Seidman
Represented By: Edward Gerard Mannion
Represented By: Kelly Maureen Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Barnes
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Elizabeth Throne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael Barnes
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Elizabeth Throne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?