Humphrey v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Lorraine Humphrey
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv05851
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
August 4, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/4/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
January 13, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/13/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT Re 8 , 9 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/12/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Humphrey
Represented By: Steven Gilberto Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Theophous H Reagans, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?