Berlin v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Monica Berlin
Defendant: LinkedIn, ProTech Security, Tracy Burris, Google, Christine De Berry, Anne-Christine Massullo, Nicole Stiving, Police Officer Ken Pon, Gretchen Rubel, Julie Lenhardt, Brandie Berlin, Warren Slocum, Georgina McInerney, Dave Pine, Adrienne Tissier, Police Officer Kelly Kruger, Carlos Bravo, Judith Holiber, Scott Bordenave, Nicole Hayes, Amabel Baxley, Michele Tom, Tiona Bostick, Justin Council, Gary Delagnes, Hersh Family Law Practice, Timothy Laird, Police Officer Andrew Lucas, Meghan Lehmer, Greg Suhr, Daisy Yim, Lifeguard AG, County of San Mateo, Police Officer Michael Dudoroff, Judith Holliber, Greg Munks, Nook Bustos, Airbnub, Police Officer Michael Greene, Michael Tobak, SLS Preschool, Molly Braun, Brenda Saunders, Police Officer John Keane, Emilia Jones, Andrew Froines, Marcus Terry, Edwin Lee, Christopher Kuhlman, Loc Nguyen, Foster City Police Department, George Gascon, Steve Wagstaffe, Michelle Tompkins, Archie Wong, Matthew Martel, John Edward McInerney, III, Carole Groom, Police Officer Reynolds, Dave Bersanti, Don Horsley, San Francisco Department Children Family Services, Erica Shore, Sophia McInerney, Peare Morrison, Carmen Ferrer, Police Officer Reese Burrows, Antonia Tombari, Asher McInerney, Majella Burns, S. Stone, City and County of San Francisco and Sally McInerney
Case Number: 3:2015cv06046
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2016 Filing 29 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/16/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/27/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2016 Filing 27 Letter dated 4/20/2016 from Monica Berlin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 26 Letter dated 4/20/2016 from Monica Berlin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 20, 2016 Filing 25 Declaration of Monica Berlin filed byMonica Berlin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 20, 2016 Filing 24 Letter dated 4/13/16 from Monica Berlin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 23 Letter dated 3/28/2016 from Monica Berlin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/16/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 21 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 20 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Quash SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT CHILDREN FAMILY SERVICES ) filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Bliss, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlos Bravo, Carole Groom, Nicole Hayes, Judith Holliber, Don Horsley, Emilia Jones, Greg Munks, Loc Nguyen, Dave Pine, Warren Slocum, Nicole Stiving, S. Stone, Adrienne Tissier, Michele Tom, Steve Wagstaffe, Daisy Yim re #18 Waiver of Service Executed,,,,,,, (Holiber, Judith) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Loc Nguyen, Carlos Bravo, Daisy Yim, Carole Groom, Nicole Stiving, Don Horsley, Dave Pine, Judith Holiber, Adrienne Tissier, Warren Slocum, Emilia Jones, Nicole Hayes, S. Stone, Greg Munks, Steve Wagstaffe, Michele Tom. Service waived by Loc Nguyen waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Carlos Bravo waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Daisy Yim waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Carole Groom waiver sent on 1/7/2016, answer due 3/7/2016; Nicole Stiving waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Don Horsley waiver sent on 1/7/2016, answer due 3/7/2016; Dave Pine waiver sent on 1/7/2016, answer due 3/7/2016; Judith Holiber waiver sent on 1/7/2016, answer due 3/7/2016; Adrienne Tissier waiver sent on 1/7/2016, answer due 3/7/2016; Warren Slocum waiver sent on 1/7/2016, answer due 3/7/2016; Emilia Jones waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Nicole Hayes waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; S. Stone waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Greg Munks waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Steve Wagstaffe waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016; Michele Tom waiver sent on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons_Slocum, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons_Tissier, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons_Pine, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons_Horsley, #5 Waiver of Service of Summons_Groom, #6 Waiver of Service of Summons_Nguyen, #7 Waiver of Service of Summons_Stiving, #8 Waiver of Service of Summons_Hayes, #9 Waiver of Service of Summons_Tom, #10 Waiver of Service of Summons_Bravo, #11 Waiver of Service of Summons_Stone, #12 Waiver of Service of Summons_Jones, #13 Waiver of Service of Summons_Yim, #14 Waiver of Service of Summons_Wagstaffe, #15 Waiver of Service of Summons_Munks)(Holiber, Judith) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Bliss NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Bliss, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 3, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Quash SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT CHILDREN FAMILY SERVICES filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 2/17/2016. Replies due by 2/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renee Erickson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Erickson, Renee) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #12 Motion for TRO; denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #2 Motion for TRO (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 13 Declaration of Monica Berlin in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byMonica Berlin. (Related document(s) #12 ) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Monica Berlin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 12, 2016 Filing 11 Declaration of PLAINTIFF'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; filed byMonica Berlin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #1 Exhibits) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2016 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & UBS/THUMBDRIVE ATTACHED TO HARD COPY; against City and County of San Francisco, et al., Filed byMonica Berlin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #1 Exhibits) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court denies plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order under FRCP 65(b). Among other things, plaintiff has failed to sufficiently establish the immediate nature of her injury that would justify issuing an order before the adverse party can be heard in opposition. It also appears that plaintiff has failed to certify in writing the efforts she has made to give notice to defendants and the reasons why notice should not be required. The Court will consider plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction under FRCP 65(a), but the Court will do so only after proof has been filed on the docket that the adverse parties have been given notice of the motion and after they have had an opportunity to respond to the motion. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/24/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rbeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/28/2015 (rbeS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #2 Signed Certificate of Service) (rbeS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2015 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Monica Berlin (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monica Berlin.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Monica Berlin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 4 Declaration of Monica Berlin in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Monica Berlin. (Related document(s) #2 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Monica Berlin. (Related document(s) #2 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Monica Berlin. Responses due by 1/6/2016. Replies due by 1/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Tracy Burris, City and County of San Francisco, Gary Delagnes, Edwin Lee, Reynolds, San Francisco Department Children Family Services, Greg Suhr (Filing fee IFPP.). Filed by Monica Berlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #5 Exhibit D) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #6 Exhibits E-G) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #7) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #8 Exhibit I) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #9 Exhibit J) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #10 Exhibits K-L) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #11 Exhibits M-T) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2015: #12 Exhibits U-BB) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berlin v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProTech Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine De Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne-Christine Massullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Stiving
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Ken Pon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lenhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandie Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Slocum
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgina McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Pine
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Tissier
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Kelly Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Bravo
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Holiber
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bordenave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Hayes
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amabel Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Tom
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiona Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Delagnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hersh Family Law Practice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Andrew Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Lehmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Yim
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeguard AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Michael Dudoroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Holliber
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nook Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Michael Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tobak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLS Preschool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilia Jones
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Froines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loc Nguyen
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wagstaffe
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archie Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Edward McInerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Groom
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Bersanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Horsley
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Department Children Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peare Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Ferrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Reese Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Tombari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majella Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Stone
Represented By: Judith A. Holiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Kimberly Bliss
Represented By: Renee Rosenblit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?