General Employees Trust Fund and Board of Trustees of General Employees Trust Fund v. Delta Window Cleaning Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: General Employees Trust Fund and Board of Trustees of General Employees Trust Fund
Defendant: Delta Window Cleaning Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv06141
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation Of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
March 10, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation Selecting Mediation.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO EXCHANGE RULE 26(a) INITIAL DISCLOSURES re: 17 . Time extended to 4/5/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/9/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Employees Trust Fund and Board of Trustees of General Employees Trust Fund v. Delta Window Cleaning Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Employees Trust Fund and Board of Trustees of General Employees Trust Fund
Represented By: Diane Sidd-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Window Cleaning Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?