Ivanoski v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Steven Ivanoski
Defendant: Volkswagen A.G. and Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv06165
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2016 Filing 22 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/03/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2151 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (2146 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 21 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/16, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509;pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1382 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1366 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1380 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 29, 2015 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:15-cv-01063. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 21, 2015 Filing 18 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ed)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline; defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint within 20 days from the date the Judicial Panel enters its ruling for transfer and centralization of this case with other related cases. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/01/2015. (lam)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s unopposed motion to stay case; this case is STAYED pending the Judicial Panel's ruling for transfer and cerntralization of this case with other related cases. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/01/2015. (lam)
November 30, 2015 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Tucker, John)
November 30, 2015 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - D'Angelo's Motion for Transfer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brewitt Motion for Transfer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Harris Motion for Transfer, #4 Exhibit 4 - DeFiesta Response)(Tucker, John)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 11/30/2015. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/30/2015. (lam)
October 28, 2015 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Tucker, John)
October 28, 2015 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Tucker on behalf of Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Tucker, John)
October 28, 2015 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin H Tucker on behalf of Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Tucker, Colin)
October 21, 2015 Docket Annotation: Disregard document #9 Unopposed Motion filed in wrong case. (pw)
October 21, 2015 Docket Annotation: Disregard documents #7 and #8 Entry of Appearance filed in the wrong case. (pw)
October 21, 2015 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Tucker, John)
October 21, 2015 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Tucker on behalf of Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Tucker, John)
October 21, 2015 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Colin H Tucker on behalf of Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Tucker, Colin)
October 1, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Ivanoski(Individually), Steven Ivanoski(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Volkswagen Group of America Inc served on 9/30/2015. (Federman, William)
September 28, 2015 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Carin L Marcussen on behalf of Steven Ivanoski(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Steven Ivanoski(Individually) (Marcussen, Carin)
September 28, 2015 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Steven Ivanoski(Individually) (Federman, William)
September 28, 2015 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance conforming with LCvR83.4 not later than 09/30/2015. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/28/2015. (lam)
September 28, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (pw)
September 25, 2015 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2153129. (Federman, William)
September 25, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Volkswagen Group of America Inc filed by Steven Ivanoski, Steven Ivanoski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanoski v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ivanoski
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Carin L. Marcussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen A.G.
Represented By: Colin H Tucker
Represented By: John H Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Represented By: Colin H Tucker
Represented By: John H Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?