Castle et al v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Steve S. Castle and Deborah J. Castle
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2015cv06203
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE For Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/17/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 29, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2016. The Court vacates the hearing scheduled for 5/4/2016 and denies 27 MOTION as moot. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/29/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato directing plaintiffs to re-file their amended complaint by March 2, 2016. See Dkt. No. 21 . The Court terminates 11 Motion to Dismiss and vacates the March 30, 2016 Case Management Conference. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 3, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. James Donato. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle et al v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve S. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP
Represented By: Christian Crutchfield Chapman
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?