Seton Medical Center v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina

Plaintiff: Seton Medical Center
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina
Case Number: 3:2015cv06254
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 13 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/25/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
January 27, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 11 Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 7, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 4 Stipulation To Extend Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of North Carolina's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/7/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seton Medical Center v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seton Medical Center
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Represented By: Christine Victoria Nitoff
Represented By: Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman
Represented By: Joy Young Stephenson
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina
Represented By: Joann V. Lee
Represented By: William E. von Behren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?