Northern California Minimally Invasive Cardiovascular Surgery et al v. NorthBay Healthcare Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Northern California Minimally Invasive Cardiovascular Surgery and Ramzi Deeik
Defendant: NorthBay Healthcare Corporation, NorthBay Healthcare Group, Inc. and NorthBay Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv06283
Filed: December 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REQUEST RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/10/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE RE SANCTIONS MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER FOLLOWING EVIDENTIARY HEARING, Motions terminated: 65 Discovery Letter Brief filed by NorthBay Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., NorthBay Healthcare Group, Inc., NorthBay Healthcare Corporation, 75 Discovery Letter Bri ef filed by Ramzi Deeik, Northern California Minimally Invasive Cardiovascular Surgery, 68 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ramzi Deeik, Northern California Minimally Invasive Cardiovascular Surgery.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW RILEY by Hon. William Alsup denying 72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE AND DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Hon. William Alsup denying 66 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND VACATING HEARING, Motions terminated: 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes filed by NorthBay Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., NorthBay Healthcare Group, Inc., NorthBay H ealthcare Corporation, 61 Discovery Letter Brief Re Tax Returns filed by NorthBay Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., NorthBay Healthcare Group, Inc., NorthBay Healthcare Corporation. Discovery Hearing set for 11/16/2016 12:15 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Judge Alsup granting 55 Stipulation; granting 56 Stipulation. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED ORDER CHANGING TIME by Hon. William Alsup granting 53 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 43 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING MOTION HEARING AND MOVING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ELEVEN A.M..(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED ORDER CHANGING TIME, Motions terminated: 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time filed by NorthBay Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., NorthBay Healthcare Group, Inc., NorthBay Healt hcare Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Replies due by 3/14/2016 AT NOON. Responses due by 2/29/2016 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern California Minimally Invasive Cardiovascular Surgery et al v. NorthBay Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Minimally Invasive Cardiovascular Surgery
Represented By: Jarod Michael Bona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramzi Deeik
Represented By: Jarod Michael Bona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthBay Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: James K. Lynch
Represented By: Meaghan Parfitt Thomas-Kennedy
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthBay Healthcare Group, Inc.
Represented By: James K. Lynch
Represented By: Meaghan Parfitt Thomas-Kennedy
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthBay Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: James K. Lynch
Represented By: Meaghan Parfitt Thomas-Kennedy
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?