Cook v. Kernan et al
Petitioner: Walter Joseph Cook, III
Respondent: Scott Kernan and Ronald Davis
Case Number: 3:2015cv06343
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re 58 USCA Order Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/28/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE SECTION 2254 PETITION by Judge Alsup denying 48 Motion for Hearing; denying 50 Motion for Hearing. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SARAH POMEROY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Judge William Alsup granting 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup denying 28 Motion to Strike.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/30/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 18 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME RE 16 MOTION TO DISMISS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 5/23/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/11/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler to show cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be issued and granting 3 ex parte application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Joseph Cook, III
Represented By: Gary Duane Sowards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?