Maxcrest Limited v. United States of America

Petitioner: Maxcrest Limited
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015mc80270
Filed: November 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER MAXCREST LIMITED'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 52 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
September 12, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 52 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE FOR PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL filed by Maxcrest Limited. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 1, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED PETITION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
June 9, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER re 38 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Maxcrest Limited, 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 22 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 38 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Maxcrest Limited, 43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxcrest Limited v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maxcrest Limited
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Thomas W. Ostrander
Represented By: Brendan Paul Ruddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?