In the Matter of Charles Thomas Marshall - #176091

Respondent: Charles Thomas Marshall
Case Number: 3:2015mc80300
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER OF SUSPENSION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/8/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
January 27, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SUSPENSION re 1 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/27/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 8, 2015 1 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2016.. Signed by Judge Donato on 12/7/15. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Charles Thomas Marshall - #176091
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?