Liberty et al v. State Bar of California

Claimant: Louis A. Liberty, Michael Z. Tun, Annette Liberty, Kathy Daly, Jim Robichaud and Han Y. Seo
Case Number: 3:2016cv00022
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/16/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson denying 23 Motion for TRO. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 13, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: jurisdiction; ORDER vacating briefing and hearing schedules. Show cause response due by 01/27/16. Opposing parties may file response by 02/03/16. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2016 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Briefing and hearing schedules on 6 20 pending motions are vacated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/13/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty et al v. State Bar of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Louis A. Liberty
Represented By: Louis Allen Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Z. Tun
Represented By: Louis Allen Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Annette Liberty
Represented By: Louis Allen Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kathy Daly
Represented By: Louis Allen Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jim Robichaud
Represented By: Louis Allen Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Han Y. Seo
Represented By: Louis Allen Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?