Schoenbart v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Theresa M. Schoenbart
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00070
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 15, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, AND (2) GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT [re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., 44 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/15/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 1, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 6, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE RE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, Replies due by 6/13/2016. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2016 at NOON Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 31, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/1/2016 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/31/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 14, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 41 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/6/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 31, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 13 21 MOTIONS TO DISMISS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 22, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE RECENT CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT DECISION Responses due by 3/25/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/22/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 17, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/17/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
February 26, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 8, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARINGS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 13, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committtee on 1/13/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoenbart v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Schoenbart
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?