Synchronoss Technologies v. Dropbox Inc

Plaintiff: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Dropbox Inc.
Miscellaneous: MARK L. HOGGE, ANNE K SUTTON, CHRISTOPHER J. MANDERNACH, ADAM D. HARBER, AVA V. BAKER, THOMAS H.L. SELBY and DAVID M. KRINSKY
Case Number: 3:2016cv00119
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 292 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to of Rajesh C. Noronha.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 290 Stipulation Changing Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 284 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Goodwyn, Robert. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 273 2/22/19 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 271 2/11/19 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 268 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to of Sarah L. O'Connor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 254 MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER. (finding as moot 198 Motion for Leave to File). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Re: 258 260 Joint Discovery Letter Briefs. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore ON DROPBOX, INC.S RENEWED 259 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE PARTIES NOVEMBER 21, 2018 JOINT LETTER CONCERNING DISCOVERY DISPUTE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 253 (Unopposed) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Ankit Bahri. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING RENEWED 245 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 243 Stipulation to Change Time.Designation of Experts due by 12/3/2018 and. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 1/28/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL Re Docket Nos. 197 , 204 and 212 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 236 Motion to Withdraw Christopher S. Geyer as Counsel of Record for Defendant Dropbox, Inc. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 210 Defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct its Invalidity Contentions; Defendant is further allowed to serve its Amended Invalidity Contentions upon Plaintiff. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (kawlc3, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 229 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Heather Khassian. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 231 Stipulated REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME.Designation of Experts due by 11/20/2018. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 1/18/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 227 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Doll. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting 207 Discovery Letter Brief and Granting 219 Discovery Letter Brief, or Ordering Plaintiff Synchronoss Technologies, Inc. to produce the requested discovery to Defendant Dropbox, Inc. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 223 Stipulated Request for Order to Complete Currently Noticed Depositions Beyond the Close of Fact Discovery [Civil Local Rule 6-2]. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 206 Defendant Drop Box Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' August 22, 2018 Joint Letter Concerning Discovery Dispute. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Plaintiff's 178 Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Granting 190 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Shailendra K. Maheshwari. Attorney Shailendra K Maheshwari terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/4/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 188 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket No. 186 in case 4:16-cv-00119-HSG and Docket No. 106 in case 4:16-cv-00120-HSG) Stipulation to Change Time for Document Production Deadline. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 175 Motion for Pro Hac Vice submitted on behalf of Ankit Bahri. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 171 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Attorney as to James M. Rice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE ( 143 , 149 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re (84 in 4:16-cv-00120-HSG and 144 in 4:16-cv-00119-HSG). Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2018; Further Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2018 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/7/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 142 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (154 in case 4:16-cv-00119-HSG and 92 in case 4:16-cv-00120-HSG Motion for Leave to File Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 147 Stipulation Re Page Limits for Parties' Claim Construction Briefs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 140 8/29/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS 136 MOTION TO CHANGE THE COORDINATED CASE SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 134 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information For Patent Litigation filed by Synchronoss Technologies, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/13/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 126 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 122 Stipulation To Change Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 120 Stipulation To Change Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/18/2017 10:00 AM; Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/23/2017 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/4/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 81 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/19/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 90 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT DROPBOX, INC. TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 81 MOTION TO DISMISS [CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2].(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Bock, Joel.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Motion to Relate Case to 16-cv-00120-HRL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Shailendra K. Maheshwari. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mandernach, Christopher. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Krinsky, David. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synchronoss Technologies v. Dropbox Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: JOEL NATHAN BOCK
Represented By: Sarah S Eskandari
Represented By: Andrew Marc Grodin
Represented By: Shailendra K Maheshwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dropbox Inc.
Represented By: ROBERT M. GOODMAN
Represented By: Adam D Harber
Represented By: David M. Krinsky
Represented By: THOMAS KILEY MURPHY, III
Represented By: Christopher John Mandernach
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Thomas H.L. Selby
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: MARK L. HOGGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: ANNE K SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: CHRISTOPHER J. MANDERNACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: ADAM D. HARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: AVA V. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: THOMAS H.L. SELBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: DAVID M. KRINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?