Anakin v. Contra Costa Regional Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Yuriy Anakin
Defendant: Contra Costa Regional Medical Center, Central Medical Laboratory, Jonathan Young, Lucas Eatchel and Officer J. Jackson
Case Number: 3:2016cv00161
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 49 Stipulation for Protective Order for Standard Litigation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 21, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Notice (Other) filed by Central Medical Laboratory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena Judge on 6/21/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 18, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend as to certain claims. Amended Complaint due by April 14, 2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 18 Stipulation.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anakin v. Contra Costa Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuriy Anakin
Represented By: Mark William Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Medical Laboratory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Eatchel
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. Jackson
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?