Whitepages, Inc. v. Isaacs et al

Plaintiff: Whitepages, Inc.
Defendant: Jeffrey Isaacs, Ianina Petrea and Greenflight Venture Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv00175
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Joint Stipulation to Vacate Initial Joint Case Management Conference(55 in 3:16-cv-00175-RS) (61 in 3:16-cv-01837-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 2, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 50 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The memorandum accompanying the notice of motion for leave shall be deemed the opening brief. Plaintiff Whitepages, Inc. shall file an opposit ion of no more than 7 pages on or before 8/9/2016. No reply will be permitted. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 9/8/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 25, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitepages, Inc. v. Isaacs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitepages, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan A. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ianina Petrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenflight Venture Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?