Chrimar Systems, Inc. et al v. Ruckus Wireless Inc.

Plaintiff: ChriMar Systems Inc and ChriMar Holding Company LLC
Defendant: Ruckus Wireless, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00186
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL 104 87 105 82 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 16, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STAY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
September 26, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY 84 in case 3:16-cv-00186-SI; 67 in case 3:16-cv-00558-SI; 84 in case 3:16-cv-00624-SI; 62 in case 3:16-cv-00897-SI. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
April 14, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by ChriMar Systems Inc, ChriMar Holding Company LLC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/13/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
February 4, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/4/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrimar Systems, Inc. et al v. Ruckus Wireless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ChriMar Systems Inc
Represented By: Justin Scott Cohen
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce John Zabarauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ChriMar Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Justin Scott Cohen
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce John Zabarauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruckus Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Shackire Oneil Anderson
Represented By: Arvind Jairam
Represented By: Louis Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Richard L. Seabolt
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Matthew Sean Yungwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?