Viant Capital,LLC. v. Savant Protection, Inc.

Plaintiff: Viant Capital,LLC.
Defendant: Savant Protection, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00197
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 28, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The hearing date for defendant Savant Protection, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, filed June 23, 2016, is continued from July 22, 2016, to the Court's next available Friday, August 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 12, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 25, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/25/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/6/2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/22/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 4, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viant Capital,LLC. v. Savant Protection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viant Capital,LLC.
Represented By: Anthony Ray Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savant Protection, Inc.
Represented By: Stefano Abbasciano
Represented By: Michael Paul Purcell
Represented By: Antonio Valla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?