HDI Global Insurance Company v. Elizabeth Court LP, et al

Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Defendant: Washington Square Assets LLC, Russell B. Flynn and Elizabeth Court LP
Case Number: 3:2016cv00210
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/20/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
August 19, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
May 6, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified re 22 Stipulation (1) Requesting the Continuance of the July 7, 2016 Motion Hearing Date and August 2, 2016 Further Telephonic Status Conference; and (2) Setting a Briefing Schedule for the Parties' Cross- Motions for Summary Judgment on HDI Global Ins. Co.'s Complaint, filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. Motions due by 6/23/2016. Cross Motions/Second Breif due by 7/7/2016. Third Brief due by 7/21/2016. Fourth Brief due by 8/4/2016. Motion Hearing re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 8/18/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/6/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Insurance Company v. Elizabeth Court LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Marium Umeki Moore
Represented By: Jennifer S Revitz
Represented By: Neil Howard Selman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Square Assets LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell B. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Court LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?