Centurion Real Estate Partners, LLC et al v. Arch Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Centurion Real Estate Partners, LLC, Centurion Real Estate Investors IV, LLC, Mission Place, LLC, American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00218
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2017. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
August 2, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as MODIFIED re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HEARING DEADLINE AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES filed by Arch Insurance Company. Discovery due by 11/1/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/2/2016. ***PLEASE DISREGARD DKT. NO. 27 .***(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
February 23, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centurion Real Estate Partners, LLC et al v. Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centurion Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By: Christine Marie Fierro
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centurion Real Estate Investors IV, LLC
Represented By: Christine Marie Fierro
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mission Place, LLC
Represented By: Christine Marie Fierro
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Marie Fierro
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Marie Fierro
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Marie Fierro
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?