Wilkins v. Macomber

Petitioner: Keenan G. Wilkins
Respondent: Jeff Macomber
Case Number: 3:2016cv00221
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL granting 82 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James Phillip Vaughns terminated. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 1, 2019 DEADLINE AND SETTING NEW DEADLINES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND REQUIRING CHOICE BY PETITIONER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER:DENYING SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; AND SETTING DEADLINES ON RENEWED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 63 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: CONSTRUING MOTION AS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE granting 61 Motion for Reconsideration. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUIRING CHOICE BY PETITIONER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER EXTENDING ANSWER DEADLINE * SEE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/SERVICE - DOCKET NO. 46 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/27/2017) Modified on 10/27/2017 (tfS, COURT STAFF). The Clerk's Office is directed to provide service.
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR COUNSEL AND DENYING MISCELLANEOUS MOTIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR AMENDMENT TO PETITION. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 05/27/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keenan G. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?