Myles v. Lew

Plaintiff: Marceline F. Myles
Defendant: Jacob J. Lew
Case Number: 3:2016cv00239
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jacob J. Lew. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
May 10, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SETTLEMENT filed by Jacob J. Lew. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
September 28, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Jacob J. Lew filed by Jacob J. Lew. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
May 31, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacob J. Lew. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
March 28, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jacob J. Lew. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myles v. Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob J. Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marceline F. Myles
Represented By: Andrew H Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?