Oswald v. Humphreys, et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Oswald
Defendant: Identiv, Inc., Steven Humphreys, Jason Hart, James E. Ousley, Gary Kremen, Saad Alazem, Daniel Wenzel and Brian Nelson
Case Number: 3:2016cv00241
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 07/20/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
November 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND STAYING CASE by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
August 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Nominal Defendant Identiv, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Ryan Oswald. Reset Deadl ines as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 9/1/2016. Replies due by 9/30/2016. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 10/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/8/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting 14 STIPULATION STAYING PROCEEDING Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings filed by Identiv, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/2016. All other proceedings, including motion practice and discovery, in this action are hereby stayed until further order of the Court. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 3, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTJoint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oswald v. Humphreys, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Identiv, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Ousley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saad Alazem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Oswald
Represented By: Robert I. Harwood
Represented By: Matthew M. Houston
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Benjamin Isaac Sachs-Michaels
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?