May v. San Mateo County et al

Plaintiff: Richard Earl May, Jr.
Defendant: San Mateo County, Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff, John Sanchez, Chris Laughlin and Eric Michel
Case Number: 3:2016cv00252
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler. The court adopts the attached Final Pretrial Order. The attached order disposes of the parties' motions in limine. The disposition of those motions in the attached order controls over the summary of the holdi ngs in this docket entry. The attached order grants in part and denies in part 86 Motion in Limine; grants in part and denies in part 88 Motion in Limine; denies 89 Motion in Limine; grants 90 Motion in Limine; grants in part and denie s in part 91 Motion in Limine; grants 94 Motion in Limine; denies 95 Motion in Limine; denies 96 Motion in Limine; denies 97 Motion in Limine; grants in part and denies in part 98 Motion in Limine; grants in part and denies in part 99 Motion in Limine; grants 100 Motion in Limine; denies 101 Motion in Limine; grants 102 Motion in Limine; grants in part and denies in part [105-1] Motion in Limine. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 9, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting [ECF 79] Motion for Reconsideration. The court vacates its earlier partial summary judgment in the defendants' favor holding that Deputy Laughlin had probable cause to arrest Mr. May for commercial burglary. The court cannot de cide this issue as a matter of law in any party's favor. The court's previous order --- that Deputy Laughlin has qualified immunity from the false-arrest claim --- stands. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/9/2017. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 15, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 70 Motion to Bifurcate. The court grants the defendants summary judgment on and dismisses with p rejudice the false-arrest claim. The court denies the motion for summary judgment on the excessive-force claim as it relates to Deputy Laughlin, including on the related qualified-immunity defense. The court grants summary judgment to Deputy Michel o n the excessive-force claim. The court dismisses the Monell claim with prejudice. The court denies the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on the Bane Act, false-arrest, and associated vicarious-liability claims under California law. In light of the court's ruling on the Monell claim, the court denies the motion to bifurcate as moot.(Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/15/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. San Mateo County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County
Represented By: Brian Eric Kulich
Represented By: Justin William Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks, San Mateo County Sheriff
Represented By: Brian Eric Kulich
Represented By: Justin William Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sanchez
Represented By: Brian Eric Kulich
Represented By: Justin William Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Laughlin
Represented By: Brian Eric Kulich
Represented By: Justin William Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Michel
Represented By: Brian Eric Kulich
Represented By: Justin William Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Earl May, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?