The McGraw Company et al v. Aegis General Insurance Agency, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The McGraw Company, Western Service Contract Corporation and Pacific Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Aegis General Insurance Agency, Inc., Timothy Summers, Troy Lee Billen and Mark Preininger
Case Number: 3:2016cv00274
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/26/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
July 13, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. The court partly grants and partly denies the defendants' motion. All the dismissals in this order are with leave to amend. (Except for the partial di smissal under the agent's-immunity rule, which is with prejudice.) If the plaintiffs wish to amend their complaint to salvage the claims and allegations dismissed by this order, they must do so by August 10, 2016. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE DEADLINES: Re 41 Stipulation filed by Aegis General Insurance Agency, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/13/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
March 25, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler Granting 26 Stipulated Request to Continue Case Deadlines.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The McGraw Company et al v. Aegis General Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The McGraw Company
Represented By: Tyler Mark Paetkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Service Contract Corporation
Represented By: Tyler Mark Paetkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tyler Mark Paetkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis General Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Korey Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Lee Billen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Preininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?