Valentine v. City of Concord et al

Plaintiff: Ray Valentine
Defendant: City of Concord and Matthew Switzer
Case Number: 3:2016cv00279
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/15/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 6, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 30 Stipulation for Protective Order. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
May 16, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion for Leave to File; denying 18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 20 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 21 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. City of Concord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Valentine
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Represented By: Stanley Craig Goff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Concord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Switzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?