Rivera v. Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony T. Rivera
Defendant: LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC, Shiwali Patel, Kimberly Davis Leback, National Nuclear Security Administration, Office of Hearings and Appeals, Department of Energy and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv00304
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order granting 64 Motion to Dismiss by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton Granting 54 Motion to Strike and Denying as Moot Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 36 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 37 Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 20 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Claim.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/9/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony T. Rivera
Represented By: Anthony P. X. Bothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiwali Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Davis Leback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Nuclear Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Hearings and Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?