Chanel, Inc. v. Charles

Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: Teresa Charles
Case Number: 3:2016cv00307
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting 28 Report and Recommendation. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
March 31, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES: Re 16 Proposed Order filed by Chanel, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/31/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
February 19, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting Chanels application for alternative service of process by email. Chanel may use the email address croquisdecor@gmail.com to serve process on Ms. Charles. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Noel Matthew Cook
Represented By: Kathleen Elaine Letourneau
Represented By: Barbara Solomon
Represented By: Emily Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?