Frausto v. California Highway Patrol et al

Plaintiff: Yolanda Frausto
Defendant: California Highway Patrol, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Kevin Beyrodt and Norman D Cornejo, II
Case Number: 3:2016cv00311
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 17, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (#82 in 3:16-cv-00311-RS) (#49 in 3:16-cv-00974-RS) Request to Dismiss Actions as to Defendants Anthony Fields, Karen Easling, and Cameron Tracy. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 8, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 80 Extending Expert Discovery Cut-Off Deadline. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
December 7, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for an Extension on all Expert Discovery Deadlines and Deadline for Hearing on Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 21, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS AFTER NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT OFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 12, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER To Take Deposition of Norman Don Cornejo #AY9089. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
July 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
April 21, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/8/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frausto v. California Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Frausto
Represented By: Michael Robert Bracamontes
Represented By: Michael Alexander Schreiber
Represented By: Ryan Joshua Vlasak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Beyrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman D Cornejo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?