Koidal v. Travis Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Koidal
Defendant: Travis Credit Union, Wells Fargo Auto Finance, Inc., Comenity Bank and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00348
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 70 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Between Plaintiff and Defendant Comenity Bank Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
June 14, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 49 Motion to Appear by Telephone at CMC & Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 3, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Between Plaintiff and Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 4, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Motion to Relate Case to 16-cv-350-CRB. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 22, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/22/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
February 25, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Stipulation re 1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (Civil L.R. 6-1).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koidal v. Travis Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Koidal
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Snavely Saelao
Represented By: Courtney C Wenrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?