O'Connor v. Lyft, Inc.

Plaintiff: Douglas O'Connor
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00351
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Re 51 Stipulation filed by Douglas O'Connor, Lyft, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/29/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
April 26, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINES.Motions due by 7/8/2016. Responses due by 8/5/2016. Replies due by 8/12/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 13, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 27 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12:00 p.m. on 4/25/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
February 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/5/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas O'Connor
Represented By: Patrick Nathaniel Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Represented By: John Peter Zaimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?