Myers v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kieva Myers
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC and Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 3:2016cv00412
Filed: January 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FEBRUARY 14, 2017 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY SIXTY (60) DAYS. Further Case Management Conference continued to 4/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
December 19, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss. Meyers' common law fraud claim is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. BMW shall answer the Second Amended Complaint within twenty days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
October 11, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick. Meyers will have 20 days to file an amended complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
July 26, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss and 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/18/2016. Replies due by 9/1/2016. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/26/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
May 4, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DATE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ACCOMMODATE SCHEDULED EARLY MEDIATION. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
March 18, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 STIPULATION seeking continuance of CMC to June 14, 2016. Case Management Conference continued to 6/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/18/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 23, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kieva Myers
Represented By: Stephen Massong Harris
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Robert Lorne Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?