Denison v. CitiFinancial Servicing LLC

Plaintiff: Ronald Charles Denison, Jr.
Defendant: CitiFinancial Servicing LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00432
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William Alsup [denying 29 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
April 29, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 11 MOTION TO STRIKE AND 12 MOTION TO DISMISS. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
March 24, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND SETTING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/24/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
February 5, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/5/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denison v. CitiFinancial Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Charles Denison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiFinancial Servicing LLC
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?