AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc. v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc., Japan Tobacco Inc., Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc and Emory University
Case Number: 3:2016cv00443
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 86 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 17, 2016 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by Japan Tobacco Inc. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Japan Tobacco Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Janssen Sciences Ireland UC, Johnson & Johnson Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Replies due by 6/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cavanaugh, William) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 82 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JORDAN ENGELHARDT PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 81 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Replies due by 6/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John P. Long in support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A to Long Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Long Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Long Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Long Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Long Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Long Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 80 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Japan Tobacco Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Replies due by 6/7/2016. (Coleman, Charles) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Lagrange Coleman, III On Behalf of Japan Tobacco Inc. (Coleman, Charles) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 78 NOTICE by Janssen Sciences Ireland UC, Johnson & Johnson Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Cavanaugh, William) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Sciences Ireland UC, Johnson & Johnson Inc. (Cavanaugh, William) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 76 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25RIFBNS.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/11/2016 filed by Janssen Sciences Ireland UC, Johnson & Johnson Inc.. (Engelhardt, Jordan) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 75 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JORDAN ENGELHARDT by Hon. William Alsup denying 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 74 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendants Japan Tobacco International U.S.A., Inc. and Akros Pharma, Inc. and Stipulation on Behalf of Japan Tobacco Inc. Agreeing Not to Challenge Service of Process filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 73 Featured Case ORDER RE PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 66 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 72 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Cavanaugh on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Inc., and Janssen Sciences Ireland UC (Cavanaugh, William) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10443536.) filed by Janssen Sciences Ireland UC, Johnson & Johnson Inc.. (Engelhardt, Jordan) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Sandrock on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Inc. and Janssen Sciences Ireland UC (Sandrock, Ryan) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 69 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lloyd Anderson on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Inc., and Janssen Sciences Ireland UC (Anderson, David) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 68 RESPONSE re 67 Request for Information. by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 5/11/2016) Modified on 5/11/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2016 67 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION RE PAGE LENGTH OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Enlargement of Briefs on Motion to Dismiss filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 29, 2016 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Janssen Sciences Ireland UC served on 4/29/2016, answer due 5/20/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 29, 2016 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Johnson & Johnson Inc. served on 4/15/2016, answer due 5/6/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 63 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Re-Setting Date for Case Management Conference filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2016. Motions due by 5/16/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/28/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2016 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Re-Setting Date for Case Management Conference filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 27, 2016 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Japan Tobacco Inc. served on 4/15/2016, answer due 5/6/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 27, 2016 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Akros Pharma Inc. served on 4/15/2016, answer due 5/6/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 25, 2016 59 STIPULATION re 50 Amended Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND filed by Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel In Support of Stipulation to Extend Time)(Coleman, Charles) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 14, 2016 58 Summons Issued as to Japan Tobacco Inc.. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 14, 2016 57 Summons Issued as to Akros Pharma Inc., Janssen Sciences Ireland UC, Johnson & Johnson Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 13, 2016 56 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 55 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 54 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 53 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 52 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 12, 2016 51 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS, Motions terminated: 32 , 29 , 34 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 11, 2016 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc., Japan Tobacco Inc., Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc., Akros Pharma Inc., Janssen Sciences Ireland UC. Filed byAIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 49 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Dismissing Without Prejudice Emory University filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 7, 2016 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 5, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 47 Featured Case ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO TAKE THE PARTIES' APRIL 28, 2016 HEARING OFF CALENDAR AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted, 32 MOTION to Dismiss , 34 ., Motions terminated: 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted, 32 MOTION to Dismiss , 34 filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc... Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 46 RESPONSE (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted, 32 MOTION to Dismiss , 34 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)) ) filed byAIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 4, 2016 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted, 32 MOTION to Dismiss , 34 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)) Joint Stipulation to Take the Parties' April 28, 2016, Hearing re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Off Calendar And Continue the April 28, 2016, Case Management Conference, And Notice of Plaintiff's Intent to File First Amended Complaint filed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 1, 2016 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc. Plaintiff AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.'s FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 23, 2016 43 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 23, 2016 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 22, 2016 41 NOTICE by Emory University Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Emory University (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 38 Proposed Order re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 37 Proposed Order re 34 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)), 36 Declaration in Support, 35 Request for Judicial Notice, by Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 36 Declaration of Jerome W. Hoffman in Support of 34 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)), 35 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byJapan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. (Related document(s) 34 , 35 ) (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 35 Request for Judicial Notice re 34 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed byJapan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gilead Form 10-Q, # 2 Exhibit B - Gilead Form 10-K, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent 8,633,219)(Related document(s) 34 ) (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 34 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed by Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/4/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 33 Declaration of John P. Long in Support of 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted filed byGilead Sciences, Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Emory University. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/4/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc (Civil Local Rule 3-15) (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 30 NOTICE by Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc (FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE) (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Counts I-III for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/4/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 16, 2016 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H Dawson (Dawson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 4, 2016 27 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 26 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 26 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 1, 2016 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY S. CASHDAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 1, 2016 24 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey S. Cashdan [re: docket entry 22] ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10250179.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/29/16 filed by Emory University. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cashdan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 1, 2016 23 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY S. CASHDAN by Hon. William Alsup denying 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 29, 2016 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey S. Cashdan ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10250179.) filed by Emory University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cashdan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 21 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 23, 2016 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 19 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Jerome W. Hoffman. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 18, 2016 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emory University.. (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 17 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT EMORY UNIVERSITY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Emory University. (Scott, Timothy) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 16 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10218941.) filed by Japan Tobacco International. (Hoffman, Jerome) (Filed on 2/17/2016) Modified on 2/17/2016 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/18/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2016 15 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Neal N. Beaton. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 12, 2016 14 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Neal N. Beaton ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10213155.) filed by Japan Tobacco International, U.S.A., Inc.. (Beaton, Neal) (Filed on 2/12/2016) Modified on 2/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2016 13 STIPULATION (JOINT) EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL, U.S.A., INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Japan Tobacco International. (Coleman, Charles) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Lagrange Coleman, III (Coleman, Charles) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 10, 2016 11 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Frischling, Gary) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 4, 2016 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Japan Tobacco International served on 1/28/2016, answer due 2/18/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Emory University served on 1/28/2016, answer due 2/18/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. Gilead Sciences, Inc. served on 1/28/2016, answer due 2/18/2016. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 27, 2016 7 Summons Issued as to Emory University, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Japan Tobacco International. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 5 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 4 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 3 Proposed Summons. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 2/9/2016. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against Emory University, Gilead Sciences, Inc., JT International U.S.A., Inc., Japan Tobacco Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10163336.). Filed byAIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hipskind, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc. v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Dorian Seawind Berger
Represented By: Arti L Bhimani
Represented By: Liza Michalina Brereton
Represented By: Daniel Paul Hipskind
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Gary N. Frischling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Tobacco Inc.
Represented By: Jerome W Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc
Represented By: Neal N. Beaton
Represented By: Charles Lagrange Coleman, III
Represented By: Jerome W Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory University
Represented By: Timothy Tully Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?