Troy Backus v. ConAgra, Inc.

Plaintiff: Troy Backus
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00454
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEALS (pursuant to 108 stipulation) by Judge William Alsup. Status Report due by 1/30/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
April 18, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge William Alsup [denying 82 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
February 8, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 77 MOTION TO STAY CASE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER (granting 76 ) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
December 22, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 59 CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 9, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 1, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 62 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 28, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 66 MOTION TO INCREASE PAGE LIMIT FOR REPLY BRIEF by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 4, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup 52 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO REMAINING CLAIM. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
August 31, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING EXCERPTS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 15, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) ORDER FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss ]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 5, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/5/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
May 17, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE AMENDED COMPLAINT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 8, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/8/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 6, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 29, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANGELA SPIVEY 11 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 4, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troy Backus v. ConAgra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Backus
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?