Morris v. USA

Plaintiff: Donald E Morris
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00476
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 23 . Stipulation filed by Donald E Morris, USA. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/14/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
August 8, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by USA Answer due by 10/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/8/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 28, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Donald E Morris, USA Answer due by 8/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/28/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 7, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulatiuon Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and [Proposed] Order filed by Donald E Morris, USA. Signed by Magistrate uJdge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/7/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 4, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulatiuon Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and [Proposed] Order filed by Donald E Morris, USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/4/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE 9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/3/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Morris
Represented By: Edward I Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?