Wright v. Stretch et al

Plaintiff: Franklin H. Wright
Defendant: Brian Stretch and Thomas Perez
Case Number: 3:2016cv00505
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PRE-FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/11/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 10, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COURT SHOULD NOT ISSUE PRE-FILING ORDER. (Certificate of Service Attached) Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2016. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/10/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
March 23, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship re 3:16cv1371-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 3/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
February 26, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/26/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Stretch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin H. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?