Rayter et al v. DeVry Education Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Alex Rayter and Ryan Herendeen
Defendant: DeVry Education Group, Inc. and DeVry University, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00507
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 25 Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate Scheduled Dates filed by DeVry University, Inc., DeVry Education Group, Inc. Dismissal or Statement due by 9/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
May 12, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by DeVry University, Inc., DeVry Education Group, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
February 4, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/4/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayter et al v. DeVry Education Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Rayter
Represented By: Ari Nathan Cherniak
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Polina Pecherskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Herendeen
Represented By: Ari Nathan Cherniak
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Polina Pecherskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry Education Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry University, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?