Greenbaum v. The Burlington Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Peter Greenbaum
Defendant: The Burlington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00511
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 1, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 34 TO EXTEND THE EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
October 11, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PERMIT CERTAIN DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
June 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenbaum v. The Burlington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Greenbaum
Represented By: Brian Banker Miles
Represented By: Joel Mastin Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Burlington Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?