Christopher Chow v. RiverSource Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Chow
Defendant: RiverSource Life Insurance Company and Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00563
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 39 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by RiverSource Life Insurance Company, Christopher Chow, Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. Initial Case Management Co nference set for 7/18/2016 is CONTINUED to 10/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Compliance Hearing is set for 10/13/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
April 21, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 23 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
February 25, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/25/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Chow v. RiverSource Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Chow
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Alan Edward Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiverSource Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?