Morris v. Koh et al

Plaintiff: Condalee Morris
Defendant: Lucy H. Koh, Richard W. Wieking and Gina Nguyen
Case Number: 3:2016cv00581
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 15 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 18, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 12 Motion FOR RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
April 29, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/29/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Koh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Condalee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy H. Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Wieking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?