David Weisberg v. Stripe, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Weisberg
Defendant: Stripe, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00584
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC AND DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AS MOOT re 35 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by David Weisberg. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 25, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 13, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ADR PROCESS filed by Stripe, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 13, 2016. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 30, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Stripe, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 21, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Stripe, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
April 15, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Stripe, Inc. filed by Stripe, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Weisberg v. Stripe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weisberg
Represented By: Joseph Miskabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripe, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lovejoy Turrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?