Grecia v. Dish Network L.L.C.

Plaintiff: William Grecia
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00588
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STATEMENT AND STIPULATION ON STAY OF CASE AND ORDER re 16-cv-00588-YGR and re (34 in 4:16-cv-06283-YGR) Statement filed by William Grecia, Adobe Systems Incorporated. Compliance hearing set for 9/15/2017 is CONTINUED to Friday, January 19, 2018 at 9:01 AM. Joint statement filed by January 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/12/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
February 23, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Compliance hearing re status of case pending in other Court is set for 9/15/2017 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint filing due 9/8/2017. * The Friday, February 24, 2017 at 9:01 AM Compliance Hearing is VACATED in light of the Stay.* Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
June 13, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF STAY PURSUANT TO FILING OF IPR; ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 39 MOTION Regarding Entry of Stay Pursuant to Filing of IPR filed by Dish Network L.L.C. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 12/16/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 11, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/11/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
April 22, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/6/2016 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecia v. Dish Network L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Represented By: Stephen Charles Jarvis
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert R. Laurenzi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Represented By: Shyamkrishna Palaiyanur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?