Ivey v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Douglas K. Ivey
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv00610
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 69 Stipulated Motion and Request for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/22/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
February 16, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 64 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 62 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
December 16, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 40 , 44 ) MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 8, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Motion to Appear by Telephone.. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 2, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
August 29, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 19 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
May 12, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
April 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 24 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
February 24, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. J Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/24/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas K. Ivey
Represented By: Stephen J. Foondos
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Goli Mahdavi
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?