Martinez v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: David Martinez
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv00627
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 25, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/25/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 4, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 18, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Martinez
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?