Rivera et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee of certificate-holders of the WaMu Mortgage Pass Through Certificate Series 2005-AR6 et al

Plaintiff: Anton Andrew Rivera and Denise Ann Rivera
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and MTC Financial
Case Number: 3:2016cv00636
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 45 Motion to Dismiss RICO Claim; Court REMANDS remainder of this action to the Contra Costa Superior Court; terminating 15 Motion to Remand. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 3, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO REMAND; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Denying as moot 10 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Denying as moot 9 M OTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Denying as moot 38 MOTION for Leave to File Late Opposition to Defendant MTC Financial's Moti on to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice filed by Anton Andrew Rivera, Denise Ann Rivera, 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by MTC Financial. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/3/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 14, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;Denying as moot 35 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
March 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 30 Amended Proposed Order filed by Anton Andrew Rivera, Denise Ann Rivera. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 15, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; ORDERING PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO PENDING MOTIONS re 25 MOTION to Shorten Time To Be Heard On Motion to Remand filed by Anton Andrew Rivera, Denise Ann Rivera. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
February 22, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 18, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Execuutive Committee on 2/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee of certificate-holders of the WaMu Mortgage Pass Through Certificate Series 2005-AR6 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Andrew Rivera
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Ann Rivera
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Philip Alan McLeod
Represented By: Joshua Byron Norton
Represented By: Stefan Perovich
Represented By: David Doss Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Philip Alan McLeod
Represented By: Joshua Byron Norton
Represented By: Stefan Perovich
Represented By: David Doss Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial
Represented By: Albert Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?