Derek Freligh v. ROC Asset Solutions, LLC

Plaintiff: Derek Freligh
Defendant: ROC Asset Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00653
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 15 Report and Recommendations.. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 6, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment. Plaintiff does not need to file a proposed order for the default judgment motion. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/6/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC. Plaintiff shall file a status report or default judgment motion by 6/2/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/6/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 3, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/3/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derek Freligh v. ROC Asset Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROC Asset Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Freligh
Represented By: Corinne Deveza Orquiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?