Products and Ventures International v. Axus Stationary (Shanghai) Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Products and Ventures International
Defendant: Axus Stationary (Shanghai) Ltd., Axus Stationary (Hong Kong) Ltd., Shanghai Marco Stationary Co. Ltd., Shanghai Laikesheng Pen Material Co. Ltd., Peifeng Xu, Andre Viegas, Highton Ltd., Roberta Trading Corporation and Kenpark Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00669
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2017 222 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
October 11, 2017 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 212 Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. The Court VACATES the motion hearing set 10/24/2017.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
August 2, 2017 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 179 Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
April 11, 2017 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 155 Motion for Substituted Service on Foreign Defendants. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 17, 2017 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 163 Motion to Dismiss as Moot; Vacating Dates. The hearing set for April 11, 2017 is VACATED. The Court also VACATES the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 162 set for April 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
January 18, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion to Dismiss; denying 117 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 128 Motion to Strike. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
November 29, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING CERTAIN FILINGS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MOTION TO STRIKE; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 119 125 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS, 128 MOTION to Strike. The Court STRIKES Dock et numbers 119 and 125 from the record. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing re Dkt. no. 128 is set for Friday, 12/9/2016 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2016. Compliance hearing re intent to withdraw filing is set for Frida y, 12/9/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Stipulation or Joint Statement filed by 12/2/2016. Court DENIES stipulation at Dkt. no. 129. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
August 15, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 21, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 75 Motion for Substituted Service; Denying Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 7, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 47 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
March 22, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Andre Viegas, Axus Stationary (Hong Kong) Ltd., Highton Ltd., Kenpark Ltd., Roberta Trading Corporation. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/22/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Products and Ventures International v. Axus Stationary (Shanghai) Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Products and Ventures International
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axus Stationary (Shanghai) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axus Stationary (Hong Kong) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Marco Stationary Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Laikesheng Pen Material Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peifeng Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Viegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highton Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenpark Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?